EP1568943 - Combustion insert for a closed fireplace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bee, Herbert Peter-Joseph-Lenné-Str. 43 54296 Trier / DE | [2005/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/03] |
Former [2005/35] | Serwe, Karl-Heinz Patentanwalt, Südallee 34 54290 Trier / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003478.4 | 18.02.2005 | [2005/35] | Priority number, date | DE20041009780 | 28.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004009780 | [2005/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1568943 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F24B1/18, F24C1/06 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
F24B1/1802 (EP);
F24C1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Title | German: | Brenneinsatz für einen geschlossenen Kaminofen | [2005/35] | English: | Combustion insert for a closed fireplace | [2005/35] | French: | Insert de combustion pour cheminée à foyer fermé | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/07] | 27.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3096754 (SOLOMON MILDRED L) [A] 1,11,12* figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [X]US3181526 (WALTER RUEGG) [X] 1 * column 2, line 24 - line 37; figure - *; | [X]DE10107065 (DEUSL ALEXANDRA [DE]) [X] 1,2,10-13 * figure -; claim - * |