EP1536441 - Solid electrolytic capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Igaki, Emiko 36-21, Tomatsu-cho 4-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0003 / JP | 02 /
Tanahashi, Masakazu 1-11-20, Kitabatake Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-0035 / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Chiharu 2-28-13 Nishikinya Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-1192 / JP | 04 /
Hashimoto, Yoshiki 9-282 Kohata-Minamiyama Uji-shi Kyoto 611-0002 / JP | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05003886.8 | 27.10.2000 | [2005/22] | Priority number, date | JP19990309280 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30928099 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1536441 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1536441 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/08, H01G9/15, H01G9/012 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
H01G9/012 (EP,US);
H01G9/042 (EP,US);
H01G9/08 (EP,US);
H01G9/12 (EP,US);
H01G9/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/22] | Title | German: | Festelektrolytkondensator | [2005/22] | English: | Solid electrolytic capacitor | [2005/22] | French: | Condensateur à électrolyte solide | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 05.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00309518.9 / EP1096520 | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.12.2010 | GB | 06.01.2011 | [2012/06] |
Former [2012/01] | GB | 06.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02306609 ; | [X]JPH04216608 ; | [X]JPH01151228 ; | [A]JPH0338817 ; | [A]JPH0945592 ; | [A]JPH0340413 ; | [A]JPS63269510 ; | [A]US4001655 (VOYLES GERALD A, et al) [A] 1,2,7,8* claim - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910308), vol. 015, no. 098, Database accession no. (E - 1042), & JP02306609 A 19901220 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,2,7-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921204), vol. 016, no. 564, Database accession no. (E - 1295), & JP04216608 A 19920806 (NEC TOYAMA LTD) [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890912), vol. 013, no. 413, Database accession no. (E - 820), & JP01151228 A 19890614 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 4,5,7,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910430), vol. 015, no. 170, Database accession no. (E - 1062), & JP03038817 A 19910219 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,2,7-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09045592 A 19970214 (NITSUKO CORP; M G K:KK) [A] 1,2,7-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910502), vol. 015, no. 175, Database accession no. (E - 1063), & JP03040413 A 19910221 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890303), vol. 013, no. 092, Database accession no. (E - 722), & JP63269510 A 19881107 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3,6-9 * abstract * |