EP1574691 - Control apparatus and control method for gasoline engine with an adjustable nozzle mechanism turbocharger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | For:DE
FR
DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For:DE
FR
DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 488-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irisawa, Yasuyuki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Kubota, Hirofumi c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Toshihiko c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref, 448-8661 / JP | [2013/20] |
Former [2005/37] | 01 /
Irisawa, Yasuyuki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
Kubota, Hirofumi c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
Tanaka, Toshihiko c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref, 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/20] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003949.4 | 23.02.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | JP20040067970 | 10.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004067970 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1574691 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1574691 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574691 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1574691 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F02D43/00, F02B37/24 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
F02D41/0007 (EP);
F02D37/02 (EP);
F02D41/0245 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/27] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Benzinmotors mit einem Turbokompressor mit verstellbaren Leitschaufeln | [2005/37] | English: | Control apparatus and control method for gasoline engine with an adjustable nozzle mechanism turbocharger | [2005/37] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de commande d'un moteur à essence muni d'un turbocompresseur à buse variable | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 13.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPS61283735 (MAZDA MOTOR) [YD] 1-8* abstract *; | [Y]EP0454943 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, column 2 - page 35, column 4 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5996347 (NAGAE MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 41 - page 3, line 17 * * figure 2 * * claim 1 *; | [IY]DE19955090 (FEV MOTORENTECH GMBH [DE]) [I] 1 * page 3, lines 33-46 * [Y] 2-8; | [A]EP1394393 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPS61283735 | JP2001227395 |