EP1568565 - Display aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cohen, Yoel 8/15 Anilevitch Street Ness Ziona 74037 / IL | For all designated states Shvadron, Hagai 20 Shivat Zion Street Kfar Saba 44286 / IL | [2005/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004009.6 | 24.02.2005 | [2005/35] | Priority number, date | US20040785044 | 25.02.2004 Original published format: US 785044 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1568565 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1568565 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/14, B42D15/04, G09F3/04, G09F3/16 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
B62B3/1428 (EP,US);
B42D15/0053 (EP,US);
B42D15/04 (EP,US);
G09F3/04 (EP,US);
G09F3/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/35] | B62B3/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [2005/35] | English: | Display aid | [2005/35] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/11] | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH348043 (GUHL & SCHEIBLER AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,8-25,27,29,30 * the whole document *; | [DX]US4512504 (OWLETT LOIS [US]) [DX] 1-3,10-16,20-24,27-30* abstract *; | [X]FR2743757 (SARL TG DIFF [FR]) [X] 1-3,10-30 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2771908 (PANODIA [FR]) [X] 1-5,10-25,28-30 * page 7, line 3 - line 15; figure 3 *; | [X]US6102199 (HO PETER PEI-TAK [US]) [X] 1,2,10-15,27-30 * figures 5,7,8 *; | [X]US6516546 (BREMICK LORI J [US]) [X] 1-5,10-15,17,18,20-25,27,29,30 * abstract * |