EP1571820 - Image processing device and method, image projection apparatus, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2014/13] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakurai, Keiichi 501, 1-5, Asahicho 5-chome Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-0025 / JP | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004126.8 | 25.02.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | JP20040054930 | 27.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004054930 | JP20050047738 | 23.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005047738 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1571820 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1571820 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571820 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, G06T3/00 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
H04N1/00283 (EP,KR,US);
G06T3/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04N1/195 (EP,KR,US);
H04N1/387 (EP,KR,US);
H04N1/40068 (EP,KR,US);
H04N2201/0436 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/36] | H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/01] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung und -Verfahren, Bildprojektionsgerät, und Programm | [2005/36] | English: | Image processing device and method, image projection apparatus, and program | [2005/36] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de traitement d'image, appareil de projection d'image, et logiciel | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0723364 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 4* the whole document *; | [Y]JP2001109422 (NIPPON AVIONICS CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,5-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] *; | [Y]US2004012679 (FAN JIAN [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-12 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * * figure 3 *; | [A] - STANLEY R. DEANS, "Hough Transform from the Radon Transform", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (198103), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 185 - 188, XP009097360 [A] 2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.1981.4767076 | Examination | WO9734257 | US2002149795 | US2003113015 | by applicant | JP2001109422 | JP2002035433 | US2004012679 |