EP1577509 - Electromechanically actuated valve control based on a vehicle electrical system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC. Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Suite 600, Parklane Towers East Dearborn MICHIGAN 48126-2490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lewis, Donald 4536 Crandall Howell Mi 48844 / US | 02 /
Michelini, John Ottavio 4324 Connie Drive Sterling Heights Michigan / US | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004351.2 | 28.02.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | US20040805573 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: US 805573 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1577509 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1577509 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577509 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/04, F01L13/00, F02D13/02, F02N19/00 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
F01L1/38 (EP,US);
F01L9/20 (EP,US);
F01L13/0005 (EP,US);
F02D13/0203 (EP,US);
F02D13/0253 (EP,US);
F02D13/06 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D41/0082 (EP,US);
F02D41/021 (EP,US);
F02N19/004 (EP,US);
F02D2013/0292 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0012 (EP,US);
F02D2200/503 (EP,US);
F02D41/064 (EP,US);
F02P5/1506 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/50] | F01L9/04, F01L13/00, F02D13/02, F02N17/08 | ||
Former IPC [2005/38] | F01L9/04, F01L13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/34] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerungsverfahren eines elektromechanisch betätigten Ventils mit Rücksicht auf ein elektrisches System des Fahrzeugs | [2005/38] | English: | Electromechanically actuated valve control based on a vehicle electrical system | [2005/38] | French: | Procédé de contrôle d'une soupape à commande électromécanique basé sur un système électrique du véhicule | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 12.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.02.2011 | GB | 28.02.2011 | [2012/11] |
Former [2012/06] | FR | 28.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5219397 (JONES KENNETH R [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0717172 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * column 7, lines 37-45; figures 2,3,6 *; | [X]JPH11324744 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]EP1209341 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0069] - [0071]; figures 2,4; claim 7 *; | [A]WO03021100 (INT TRUCK INTELLECTUAL PROP CO [US]) [A] 1-7* figure 3 *; | [X]US2003172892 (GLUGLA CHRISTOPHER PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0019] , [0025] , [0026]; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [X]EP1375241 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0063]; figures 2,9C,13 * |