EP1571603 - Sheet handling machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi-Omron Terminal Solutions, Corp. 6-3, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Yasuhiro c/o Hitachi-Omron Terminal Solutions Corp. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hamada, Koichi c/o Hitachi-Omron Terminal Solutions Corp. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Takeshi c/o Hitachi-Omron Terminal Solutions Corp. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Hata, Hidetoshi c/o Hitachi-Omron Terminal Solutions Corp. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/51] |
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
Shimizu, Yasuhiro c/o Hitachi-Omron Term Sol Corp 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Hamada, Koichi c/o Hitachi-Omron Term Sol Corp 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Nakamura, Takeshi c/o Hitachi-Omron Term Sol Corp 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Hata, Hidetoshi c/o Hitachi-Omron Term Sol Corp 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2014/19] |
Former [2005/36] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004380.1 | 28.02.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | JP20040057541 | 02.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004057541 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1571603 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571603 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/00 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
B65H7/00 (EP,US);
G03G15/60 (EP,US);
G07D11/237 (EP,US);
G07D11/40 (EP,US);
G07D7/00 (EP,US);
B65H2402/10 (EP,US);
B65H2402/60 (EP,US);
B65H2511/30 (EP,US);
B65H2511/51 (EP,US);
B65H2513/512 (EP,US);
B65H2601/25 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1912 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/30, B65H2220/03 (US,EP);
B65H2511/51, B65H2220/01 (US,EP);
B65H2513/512, B65H2220/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2006/21] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung von Blattgut | [2005/36] | English: | Sheet handling machine | [2005/36] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de feuilles | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5421725 ; | [A]US5024431 (SHIMIZU TADAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 6, line 1 - column 8, line 55 *; | [A]US5678123 (KIM YOUNG-JU [KR]) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 59 *; | [XY]US2002092727 (KATO RIICHI [JP]) [X] 1,19,20 [Y] 2,3; | [XY]US2003156298 (MATSUYAMA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0006] , [0014]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790410), vol. 003, no. 041, Database accession no. (E - 103), & JP54021725 A 19790219 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 2,3,7-11 * abstract * |