EP1577625 - Refractory material heat shield [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jünger + Gräter GmbH Feuerfestbau Robert-Bosch-Strasse 1 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | [2005/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imle, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Lindenbergstrasse 40 76829 Landau-Nussdorf / DE | 02 /
Hampel, Hardy, Dipl.-Ing. Steinbachweg 37 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Martin, Karl-Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing. Christian-Bitter-Strasse 28 69126 Heidelberg / DE | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Ursula Gluckstrasse 3 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2005/38] | Application number, filing date | 05004403.1 | 01.03.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | DE20041013722 | 18.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004013722 | [2005/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577625 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577625 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/12, F27D1/14, F22B37/10, F23M5/04, F23M5/02 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
F27D1/12 (EP);
F27D1/145 (EP);
F27D2009/0027 (EP);
F27D2009/0054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Title | German: | Feuerfestabkleidung | [2005/38] | English: | Refractory material heat shield | [2005/38] | French: | Ensemble écran thermique refractaire | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 26.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.05.2009 | CZ | 06.05.2009 | DK | 06.05.2009 | EE | 06.05.2009 | FI | 06.05.2009 | IE | 06.05.2009 | IT | 06.05.2009 | LT | 06.05.2009 | NL | 06.05.2009 | PL | 06.05.2009 | RO | 06.05.2009 | SI | 06.05.2009 | SK | 06.05.2009 | TR | 06.05.2009 | BG | 06.08.2009 | SE | 06.08.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | ES | 17.08.2009 | IS | 06.09.2009 | PT | 06.09.2009 | HU | 07.11.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
HU | 07.11.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 06.05.2009 | |
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | FI | 06.05.2009 | |
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FI | 06.05.2009 | |
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | LT | 06.05.2009 | |
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 17.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2337163 (LINCO GMBH) [Y] 1,2,4 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 29 * * page 3, line 28 - line 31 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE4108754 (SCHWEISS SERVICE DETLEF KOESTE [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE29504758U (CARBORUNDUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 6 * page 2, line 24 - line 33 * * page 6, line 10 - line 16 ** figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2002077767 (TERASHIMA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0113]; figures 5-9 *; | [DY]EP1336808 (JUENGER & GRAETER GMBH FEUERFE [DE]) [DY] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 1,2 * |