EP1574472 - Elevator system with driving gear incorporated in the counterweight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gabl, Herbert Fassergasse 39 6060 Hall / AT | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 05004505.3 | 02.03.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | DE20041010528 | 04.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004010528 | [2005/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1574472 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1574472 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | [2006/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574472 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B66B17/12 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B66B11/0055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Aufzugsanlage mit einer im Gegengewicht integrierten Antriebseinheit | [2005/37] | English: | Elevator system with driving gear incorporated in the counterweight | [2005/37] | French: | Système d'ascenseur avec entraînement incorporé dans le contrepoids | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 30.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.12.2007 | DK | 12.12.2007 | EE | 12.12.2007 | FI | 12.12.2007 | LT | 12.12.2007 | NL | 12.12.2007 | PL | 12.12.2007 | RO | 12.12.2007 | SI | 12.12.2007 | SK | 12.12.2007 | TR | 12.12.2007 | BG | 12.03.2008 | SE | 12.03.2008 | GR | 13.03.2008 | BE | 31.03.2008 | IS | 12.04.2008 | HU | 13.06.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | CY | 12.12.2007 | |
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
HU | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 12.12.2007 | |
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | DK | 12.12.2007 | |
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 12.12.2007 | |
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IS | 12.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
LT | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0631969 (KONE OY [FI]) [X] 1-3,14 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0035800 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]WO0053520 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,14 * figures 2,7,8 *; | [X]US6138799 (SCHROEDER-BRUMLOOP HELMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,14 * column 3; figures 2,4 *; | [AE]EP1595840 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [AE] 1-14 * figure 3 * |