EP1571070 - Composite part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hölzl, Anja Am Brünnele 4 86441 Wörleschwang / DE | 02 /
Scheydecker, Michael Meisenweg 1 89278 Nersingen / DE | [2005/36] | Application number, filing date | 05004524.4 | 02.03.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | DE20041010762 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004010762 | [2005/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1571070 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1571070 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D29/00 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
B62D29/001 (EP);
B22D19/0081 (EP);
B22D19/04 (EP);
B22D19/16 (EP);
B22D21/007 (EP);
B62D29/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbundbauteil | [2005/36] | English: | Composite part | [2005/36] | French: | Pièce composite | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3809139 (LPW CHEMIE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 2* page 2, line 5 - line 6 *; | [A]EP0497209 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 6 * column 2, line 21 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9639322 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 16 * * page 12, line 35 - page 13, line 5; figure - *; | [Y]DE19746167 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3-7 * column 4, line 38 - line 44; figure - *; | [Y]DE19839722 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [Y] 2 * figure 1; claims 1,3 *; | [PA]EP1439111 (DANA CORP [US]) [PA] 1,3 * column 17, line 1 - line 39; figure 11 * | by applicant | DE10153712 |