EP1571540 - Haptic input device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Ken Alps Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | 02 /
Hayasaka, Satoshi Alps Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004682.0 | 03.03.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | JP20040062498 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004062498 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1571540 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1571540 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G06F2203/014 (EP,US);
G06F2203/015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/43] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Haptische Eingabevorrichtung | [2005/36] | English: | Haptic input device | [2005/36] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée haptique | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 02.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP7120247B (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 1,3* the whole document *; | [A]EP0498540 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 2,5 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 47; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US5381080 (SCHNELL KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 36; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 9 - line 23; figures 3g,3h *; | [X]US5825308 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 31, line 50 - line 65; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US6154201 (LEVIN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 5, line 25 - line 46; figure 1 * * column 7, line 27 - line 58; figure 2 * * column 10, line 8 - line 21 * * column 14, line 28 - column 16, line 48; figures 6A-6D * * column 20, line 47 - column 21, line 7; figure 8 *; | [A]WO0223322 (THALES SA [FR], et al) [A] 2,5 * page 10, line 6 - page 11, line 11; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2002109668 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0095]; figures 6a,6b * |