EP1575103 - Battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higashino, Tatsuya 5-2-6-304, Chuourinkan Yamato-shi Kanagawa-ken 242-0007 / JP | 02 /
Muramatsu, Satoshi 1-3-17-1403, Chuo Ebina-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0432 / JP | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004689.5 | 03.03.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | JP20040068870 | 11.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004068870 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1575103 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1575103 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575103 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M10/04, H01M10/50 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H01M10/0413 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0468 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0585 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/647 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6557 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6563 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/24 (EP,KR,US);
H01M6/42 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/03] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Batterie | [2005/37] | English: | Battery | [2005/37] | French: | Batterie | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3822462 (DEUTSCHE AUTOMOBILGESELLSCHAFT MBH, 3000 HANNOVER, DE) [Y] 3-6,9,10 * column 1, line 48 - line 52 * * column 4, line 37 - line 41 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5114807 (ROWLETTE JOHN J [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-12 * * column 3, line 6 - line 44 * * column 3, line 59 - line 64 * * column 4, line 41 - line 51 * * column 5, line 44 - line 47 * * column 6, line 67 - line 68 * * column 7, line 20 - line 37 *; | [A]US5558949 (IWATSUKI SYUICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16* column 3, line 29 - line 59 *; | [Y]US2002012833 (GOW PHILIPPE [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * figures 1-5 * * claims 1-26 *; | [XY]EP1278263 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,12-16 * paragraph [0013] * * figure 1 * [Y] 3-10; | [XY]US2003124416 (KANETA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,11-16 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * [Y] 9,10; | [PY]US2004137321 (SAVARIA JEAN-FRANCOIS [CA], et al) [PY] 3-5,9,10 * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] * * claims 1,5,8 * | by applicant | DE3822462 | JPH09259859 | JP2001236937 | US2002012833 | EP1278263 | US2003124416 | US2004137321 |