EP1600830 - Control system and control method, in particular for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/05] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naono, Ken c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Masaaki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Arakawa, Fumio c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Kanekawa, Nobuyasu c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Sakurai, Kohei c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 06 /
Hoshino, Masatoshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 07 /
Yoshimura, Kentaro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/48] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05004959.2 | 07.03.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | JP20040157295 | 27.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004157295 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600830 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1600830 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
G05B13/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/31] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuersystem und -verfahren, ins besondere für Fahrzeuge | [2005/48] | English: | Control system and control method, in particular for vehicles | [2005/48] | French: | Système et méthode de commande, en particulier pour des véhicules | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4577718 (UENO MASAHITO [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]DE4428351 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 1 *; | [Y]EP0901055 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] *; | [X]EP1148394 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0033] *; | [XY]WO0179947 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8 * page 9, line 17 - page 10, line 6 * [Y] 5,6 |