EP1608112 - Differential delay compensation and measurement in bonded systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cassiers, Raphael Rue Coleau, 58 1410 Waterloo / BE | 02 /
Peeters, Miguel Rue Konkel, 184 1200 Brussels / BE | 03 /
Christiaens, Benoit Rue du Jardinage, 102 1082 Brussels / BE | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Jehle, Volker Armin Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/51] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch, Graf v. Stosch, Jehle Patentanwalt GmbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05005156.4 | 09.03.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | US20040578900P | 14.06.2004 Original published format: US 578900 P | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1608112 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1608112 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
H04L12/5601 (EP,US);
H04B3/462 (EP,US);
H04J3/0682 (EP,US);
H04L1/1896 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5624 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/35] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kompensation und Messung der Differentiellen Verzögerung in gebundenen Systemen | [2005/51] | English: | Differential delay compensation and measurement in bonded systems | [2005/51] | French: | Compensation et mesure du retard différentiel pour systèmes liés | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.04.2011 | [2012/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5450394 (GRUBER JOHN G [CA], et al) [A] 1-3,8,9 * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 35 * * column 6, line 22 - line 39 *; | [A]US5812528 (VANDERVORT COLE S [US]) [A] 1-3,8,9 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 29 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 4 ** abstract *; | [X]US2002146010 (SHENOI KISHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] *; | [X] - ROPPEL C ED - PUIGJANER R (ED) INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION FOR INFORMATION PROCESSING (IFIP), "IN-SERVICE MONITORING TECHNIQUES FOR CELL TRANSFER DELAY AND CELL DELAY VARIATION IN ATM NETWORKS", HIGH PERFORMANCE NETWORKING 6. IFIP 6TH. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HIGH PERFORMANCE NETWORKING. (HPN). PALMA DE MALLORCA, SEPT. 13 - 15, 1995, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HIGH PERFORMANCE NETWORKING (HPN), LONDON, CHAPMAN & HALL, GB, (19950911), vol. CONF. 6, ISBN 0-412-73290-4, pages 131 - 142, XP000624332 [X] 1-3,8,9 * abstract * * page 132, line 4 - line 5 * * page 132, line 19 - line 25 * * page 133, line 32 - line 45 * * page 134, line 11 - line 24 * | [A] - WITTEVRONGEL S ET AL, "MEASUREMENTS AND SIMULATIONS OF CELL DELAYS IN ATM SWITCHES", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS, AEI, MILANO, IT, (199805), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1124-318X, pages 237 - 244, XP000766236 [A] 1-3,8,9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [04.1] * |