EP1577842 - Access control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SkiData AG Untersbergstrasse 40 5083 Gartenau / AT | [2005/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ponert, Gregor Imma von Troll Strasse 11 5020 Salzburg / AT | 02 /
Wallerstorfer, Kurt 130 5204 Irrsdorf / AT | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Karakatsanis, Georgios, et al Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Schönfelstraße 26 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Karakatsanis, Georgios, et al Haft - Karakatsanis Occamstrasse 3 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | Berngruber, Otto Patentanwälte Haft, von Puttkamer Berngruber, Czybulka Franziskanerstrasse 38 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05005554.0 | 15.03.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | DE20041013965 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004013965 | [2005/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1577842 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1577842 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577842 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
G07C9/10 (EP,US);
G07C9/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Title | German: | Zugangskontrollvorrichtung | [2005/38] | English: | Access control device | [2005/38] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle d'accès | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2005 | CY | 14.09.2011 | CZ | 14.09.2011 | DK | 14.09.2011 | EE | 14.09.2011 | FI | 14.09.2011 | IE | 14.09.2011 | IT | 14.09.2011 | LT | 14.09.2011 | NL | 14.09.2011 | PL | 14.09.2011 | RO | 14.09.2011 | SE | 14.09.2011 | SI | 14.09.2011 | SK | 14.09.2011 | TR | 14.09.2011 | BG | 14.12.2011 | GR | 15.12.2011 | ES | 25.12.2011 | IS | 14.01.2012 | PT | 16.01.2012 | GB | 15.03.2012 | LU | 15.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 15.03.2012 | ||
LU | 15.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 15.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 15.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 15.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
GB | 15.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 14.09.2011 | |
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 14.09.2011 | |
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 14.09.2011 | |
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 14.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3825769 (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE]) [A] 17 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0563017 (ITALDIS IND SPA [IT]) [A] 30,31* column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 19 *; | [A]DE4308193 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 20 * column 4, line 4 - line 9 * * column 4, line 44 - line 48 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9634367 (THORN TRANSIT SYSTEMS INT [GB], et al) [A] 7-9,11-15 * page 5, line 10 - line 18 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]WO9718379 (SKIDATA COMPUTER GES MBH [AT], et al) [DA] 5,6,25-29 * abstract * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 29 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5837982 (FUJIOKA SHUZO [JP]) [A] 4 * column 2, line 32 - line 42 * * figures 1,2 *; | [DX]AT6665U (KARL GOTSCHLICH MASCHB GES M B [AT]) [DX] 1,3-31 * abstract * * page 4, line 37 - page 5, line 27 * * claim 6 * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US6617960 |