EP1578135 - Image coding apparatus and method for predicting motion using rotation matching [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Hwa-Soon c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416- Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Seung-Cheol c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416- Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05005625.8 | 15.03.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | KR20040017453 | 15.03.2004 Original published format: KR 2004017453 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1578135 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1578135 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
H04N19/51 (EP,US);
E04F11/1834 (KR);
H04N19/527 (EP,US);
E04F2011/1821 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/34] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildcodierungsvorrichtung und -verfahren zur Bewegungsprädiktion mittels Rotationsübereinstimmung | [2005/38] | English: | Image coding apparatus and method for predicting motion using rotation matching | [2005/38] | French: | Appareil et méthode de codage d'image pour la prédiction de mouvement utilisant un correspondance rotationelle | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 13.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/19] | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0905980 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0019] - [0064] * * paragraphs [0078] - [0129] * * figures 1-5,10-13,16,28-30,35,36,45-48 *; | [A]US6052414 (LEE SHI-HWA [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 25; figure 2 *; | [X]US6236682 (OTA TAKAAKI [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 4, line 51 - column 9, line 33 * * column 14, line 14 - column 18, line 58 * * figures 1,16 *; | [A] - CHIOU-SHANN FUH ET AL, "MOTION DISPLACEMENT ESTIMATION USING AN AFFINE MODEL FOR IMAGE MATCHING", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SOC. OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS. BELLINGHAM, US, (19910701), vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 0091-3286, pages 881 - 887, XP000217388 [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * |