EP1674725 - Reciprocating compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Hyuk Neulpurun Byucksan Apt.105-301 Daeya-Dong Siheung-Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
Jeong, Sang-Sub 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/26] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05005679.5 | 16.03.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | KR20040110649 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: KR 2004110649 | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1674725 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1674725 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1674725 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04B35/04 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
H02K33/16 (EP,KR,US);
F04B35/045 (EP,KR,US);
F04B39/0005 (KR);
F04B39/0044 (KR);
F04B39/10 (KR);
F04B39/12 (KR);
F16B5/02 (KR);
H02K1/185 (KR);
H02K1/187 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/39] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kolbenpumpe | [2006/26] | English: | Reciprocating compressor | [2006/26] | French: | Pompe à piston | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02082624 (BRASIL COMPRESSORES SA [BR], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]WO2004057188 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004081378 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004208759 (HONG EON-PYO [KR]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |