EP1595732 - Device for a vibration damping mounting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogel, Friedemann Weiherweg 2 85080 Gaimersheim / DE | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Asch, Konrad AUDI AG Patentabteilung I/EX 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Asch, Konrad AUDI AG, Patentabteilung I/EX 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 05005703.3 | 16.03.2005 | [2005/46] | Priority number, date | DE20041024084 | 14.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004024084 | [2005/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1595732 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1595732 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60K5/12 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
B60K5/1283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/29] |
Former [2005/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur schwingungsdämpfenden Lagerung | [2005/46] | English: | Device for a vibration damping mounting | [2005/46] | French: | Dispositif à montage antivibratoire | [2005/46] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 14.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3432768 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]EP0480459 (METZELER GIMETALL AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,11,12 * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 9; figure 11 *; | [X]EP0512195 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9617184 (AVON CLEVITE LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figure 6 *; | [A]DE19812837 (MANNESMANN BOGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19961968 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,11,12 * figures 1,2 * |