EP1580797 - Electrode system with an electrical feedthrough through a ceramic component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstr. 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [2015/08] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Heraeus Materials Technology GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states W.C. Heraeus GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12 - 14 63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiland, Reinhold Dr. Ronneburgstrasse 7 63543 Neuberg / DE | 02 /
Lupton, David F. Am Rain 8 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 03 /
Manhardt, Harald Tannenweg 7 63486 Bruchköbel / DE | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 05005794.2 | 17.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | DE20041015467 | 26.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004015467 | [2005/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1580797 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1580797 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/28, H01J61/36, H01J9/32 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
H01J9/323 (EP,US);
H01J61/36 (EP,US);
H01J9/28 (EP,US);
H01J61/366 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/39] | H01J61/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Elektrodensystem mit einer Stromdurchführung durch ein Keramikbauteil | [2005/39] | English: | Electrode system with an electrical feedthrough through a ceramic component | [2005/39] | French: | Système d'électrode avec une traversée électrique à travers un composant céramique | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 31.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 16.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4011480 (JACOBS CORNELIS ADRIANUS JOANN, et al) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract *; | [X]US5424609 (GEVEN ANDREAS SEBASTIANUS GERT [NL], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 9, line 42 - line 59; figure 2 * * column 5, line 54 - line 65 *; | [X]JPH1050262 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]DE19743702 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5 * page 6, line 41 - line 42; figure 3 *; | [X]DE19933154 (HERAEUS GMBH W C [DE]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * page 3, line 35 - line 40; figure 1; claim 2 *; | [XY]EP1193734 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0018] , [3636] , [0043] , [0044] , [0053]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0018] * [Y] 1-5; | [Y]WO03096377 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - line 28 * * page 3, line 10 - line 13 * * page 4, line 19 - line 27 * * page 6, line 1 - line 34 * * figures 3,6,7 * | Examination | US4396577 |