EP1703128 - Cryogenic pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanzetti Engineering S.r.l. Via Avv. Giovanni Agnelli 10 12033 Moretta (CN) / IT | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tschopp, Claudio Heissgländstrasse 26 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | [2012/19] |
Former [2008/39] | Bohest AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2008/31] | Heinen, Detlef, et al BOHEST AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2006/38] | Heinen, Detlef, et al c/o A.Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG, Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 05005815.5 | 17.03.2005 | [2006/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703128 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703128 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04B53/16 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
F04B53/168 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Title | German: | Pumpe für ein kryogenes Fluid | [2006/38] | English: | Cryogenic pump | [2006/38] | French: | Pompe cryogénique | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 28.03.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.03.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2005 | CY | 09.05.2012 | CZ | 09.05.2012 | DK | 09.05.2012 | EE | 09.05.2012 | FI | 09.05.2012 | LT | 09.05.2012 | NL | 09.05.2012 | PL | 09.05.2012 | RO | 09.05.2012 | SE | 09.05.2012 | SI | 09.05.2012 | SK | 09.05.2012 | BG | 09.08.2012 | GR | 10.08.2012 | IS | 09.09.2012 | PT | 10.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2013/34] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 09.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1730905 (IDRIS THOMAS, et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]GB638585 (BRITISH OILFIELD EQUIPMENT COM, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2732809 (MATTINGLY V.R.) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2973629 (LADY EDWARD R) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0730092 (CRYOPUMP AG [CH]) [DY] 1 * the whole document * |