EP1632737 - Air-conditioner and method for controlling driving thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2010/49] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwang, Yoon-Jei Miseong Apt. B-107 Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Hyun, Seung-Youp Daerim 2-cha Woosung Apt. 102-1303, Guro 6-Dong Guro-Gu, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Lee, Won-Hee Kukdong Apt. 105-1004, 101, Hyeonjeo-Dong Seodaemun-Gu, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Sim, Jae-Hoon 264-25, Gocheok 2-Dong Guro-Gu, Seoul / KR | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/10] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05005924.5 | 18.03.2005 | [2006/10] | Priority number, date | KR20040066065 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: KR 2004066065 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1632737 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1632737 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1632737 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02, F24F11/00 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
F24F11/61 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/77 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/62 (KR);
F24F11/63 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/76 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/86 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F2110/10 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2140/50 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/17] |
Former [2006/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage und Verfahren zum Steuern ihres Antriebes | [2010/33] | English: | Air-conditioner and method for controlling driving thereof | [2006/10] | French: | Conditionneur d'air et méthode pour commander son entraînement | [2006/10] |
Former [2006/10] | Klimaanlage und Verfahren zum Steuern Ihres Antriebes | Examination procedure | 21.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 19.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 18.03.2011 | [2012/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5123256 (OLTMAN ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1,5,9,15,17 * figure 4 *; | [A]US5303561 (BAHEL VIJAY [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9,15,17* figures 4,17 *; | [A]US6397610 (WENG KUO-LIANG [TW], et al) [A] 1,5,9,15,17 * abstract *; | [DA]US6519957 (HUH DEOK [KR], et al) [DA] 1-20 * abstract * * column 3, line 35 - column 6, line 42; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1398576 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0058] - [0060]; figure 6; claim 1 *; | [A]US2004118135 (LEE WON HEE [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0060] * |