EP1578017 - Electronic switch for high-frequency connections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feig Electronic GmbH Lange Strasse 4 35781 Weilburg-Waldhausen / DE | [2005/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wennrich, Andreas Bartholomäusstr. 3 65554 Limburg / DE | 02 /
Eichel, Klaus H. St.-Barbara-Str. 28 89264 Weissenhorn / DE | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Knefel, Cordula Patentanwältin Postfach 1924 35529 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Knefel, Cordula Patentanwältin, Postfach 1924 35529 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 05005978.1 | 18.03.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | DE20041014027 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004014027 | [2005/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1578017 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1578017 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1578017 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/74 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
H03K17/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/10] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronischer Schalter für Hochfrequenz-Verbindungen | [2005/38] | English: | Electronic switch for high-frequency connections | [2005/38] | French: | Commutateur électronique pour connexions haute fréquence | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 29.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.02.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.03.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/33] | ES | 28.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH114151 ; | [A]DE4422069 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 58; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003174099 (BAUER DONALD GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [XAY]WO2004023651 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 31; figures 1,2 * [A] 4-9 [Y] 2,3; | [PA]DE10305361 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [PA] 1-9* paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0043]; figures 3-7 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11004151 A 19990106 (SHOWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO LTD) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * | by applicant | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04 |