EP1703183 - Check valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bittner, Jörg Georg-Bickel-Str. 3 69514 Laudenbach / DE | 02 /
Engel, Jürgen Sandweg 4 64407 Fränkisch-Crumbach / DE | 03 /
Daume, Volker Michelberg 22 69434 Hirschhorn / DE | [2006/38] | Application number, filing date | 05005981.5 | 18.03.2005 | [2006/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703183 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703183 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16K15/14, F02M25/08 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
F16K15/144 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Title | German: | Rückschlagventil | [2006/38] | English: | Check valve | [2006/38] | French: | Clapet anti-retour | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.07.2007 | CZ | 11.07.2007 | DK | 11.07.2007 | EE | 11.07.2007 | FI | 11.07.2007 | GB | 11.07.2007 | IE | 11.07.2007 | LT | 11.07.2007 | NL | 11.07.2007 | PL | 11.07.2007 | RO | 11.07.2007 | SI | 11.07.2007 | SK | 11.07.2007 | TR | 11.07.2007 | BG | 11.10.2007 | SE | 11.10.2007 | GR | 12.10.2007 | ES | 22.10.2007 | IS | 11.11.2007 | PT | 11.12.2007 | HU | 12.01.2008 | AT | 18.03.2008 | LU | 18.03.2008 | BE | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | CY | 11.07.2007 | |
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
HU | 12.01.2008 | ||
AT | 18.03.2008 | ||
LU | 18.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 11.07.2007 | |
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
AT | 18.03.2008 | ||
LU | 18.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 11.07.2007 | |
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
AT | 18.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 11.07.2007 | |
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 11.07.2007 | |
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 11.07.2007 | |
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 11.07.2007 | |
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 11.07.2007 | |
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 11.07.2007 | |
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 11.07.2007 | |
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
IE | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 11.07.2007 | |
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 11.07.2007 | |
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 11.07.2007 | |
LT | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IS | 11.11.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | LT | 11.07.2007 | |
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 11.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5025829 (EDWARDS FLOYD V [US], et al) [X] 1,3-17,19-21 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 53; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0582038 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-14,16,17,19-21 * column 10, line 36 - column 12, line 3; figures 12,12a,12b *; | [X]EP0612537 (FILTERTEK SA [FR]) [X] 1,3-8,19-21 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0638328 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-14,16,17,19-21 * abstract * [Y] 2; | [A]DE4439881 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1,22,25 * abstract *; | [A]US5809977 (KRIMMER ERWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,22-25* figure 1 *; | [Y]US2003188790 (SCHMALZ KURT [DE], et al) [Y] 2 * figure - * |