EP1555628 - Apparatus and method for issuing documents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Data Corporation 6200 South Quebec Street Ste.330 AN Englewood, CO 80111 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states First Data Corporation 6200 South Quebec Street Ste.330 AN Englewood, CO 80111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seifert, Dean Alan, First Data Corporation 6200 South Quebec Street, Ste. 330 AN Englewood, CO 80111 / US | 02 /
Stoutenburg, Earney, First Data Corporation 6200 South Quebec Street, Ste. 330 AN Englewood, CO 80111 / US | 03 /
Vogt, Paul J., First Data Corporation 6200 South Quebec Street, Ste. 330 AN Englewood, CO 80111 / US | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006048.2 | 02.10.1997 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | US19960726133 | 04.10.1996 Original published format: US 726133 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1555628 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1555628 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/42, G07G5/00 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G06Q20/042 (EP,US);
G07F17/42 (EP,US);
G06Q20/403 (EP,US);
G07F17/26 (US);
G07F5/18 (EP,US);
G07F9/002 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/29] | G06F17/60, G07G5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Ausgabe von Dokumenten | [2005/29] | English: | Apparatus and method for issuing documents | [2005/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour délivrer des documents | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/44] | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97945424.6 / EP0929871 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970945424) is 24.06.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4894784 (SMITH LAWRENCE G [US]) [Y] 11-23 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 29 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 33 * * column 5, line 15 - line 25 * * column 6, line 15 - line 63 * * column 7, line 43 - column 9, line 63 *; | [A]FR2691273 (HELLO SA [FR]) [A] 1,3-6,24-27* page 5, line 22 - page 7, line 22 *; | [X]WO9409580 (TRAVELERS EXPRESS COMPANY INC [US]) [X] 1-27 * page 4, line 8 - line 22 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 25 * * page 12, line 15 - page 13, line 35 * * page 14, line 17 - page 16, line 25 * * page 19, line 1 - page 20, line 17 *; | [XY]WO9525320 (GIFT CERTIFICATE CENTER INC [US]) [X] 1-10,24-27 * page 4, line 23 - line 28 * * page 9, line 13 - page 10, line 22 * * page 13, line 1 - page 15, line 32; figures 5,6 * [Y] 11-23 |