EP1582543 - Moisture-curable prepolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niesten, Meike, Dr. Morgengraben 2 51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
Irle, Christoph, Dr. Passatge Sant Iluis 8 08960 Sant Just Desvern / ES | 03 /
Comajuan, Federico Charles Darwin 16 casa 9 08329 Teia / ES | 04 /
Guiteras, Maria Almato, Dr. C. Salses 102, 1-1 08031 Barcelona / ES | 05 /
Vicente, Amadeo C. Guitard 33 At-1 08014 Barcelona / ES | [2005/40] | Application number, filing date | 05006049.0 | 19.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | DE20041015986 | 01.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004015986 | [2005/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582543 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582543 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/76, C08G18/79, C08G18/10, C09D175/04 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
C08G18/794 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/482 (EP,US);
C08G18/4837 (EP,US);
C08G18/725 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/307 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | LV | 05.04.2006 | Title | German: | Feuchtigkeitshärtende Prepolymere | [2005/40] | English: | Moisture-curable prepolymers | [2005/40] | French: | Prepolymères durcissables par l'humidité | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 11.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | IE | 07.11.2007 | LT | 07.11.2007 | RO | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | BG | 07.02.2008 | SE | 07.02.2008 | IS | 07.03.2008 | LU | 19.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | [2010/33] |
Former [2009/36] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | EE | 07.11.2007 | |
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | IE | 07.11.2007 | |
LT | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | LT | 07.11.2007 | |
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | LT | 07.11.2007 | |
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | LT | 07.11.2007 | |
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | LT | 07.11.2007 | |
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | LT | 07.11.2007 | |
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
IS | 07.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003208025 (MISKOVIC MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1378529 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-7* the whole document * |