EP1582727 - Diesel Engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2015/19] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimazaki, Naoki@Isuzu Adv. Engineering Center Ltd 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Nishimura, Terukazu@Isuzu Adv. Engin. Center Ltd. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2015/19] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
Shimazaki, Naoki Isuzu Adv. Engineering Center Ltd 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Nishimura, Terukazu Isuzu Adv. Engin. Center Ltd. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006310.6 | 22.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040103050 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004103050 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582727 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582727 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582727 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/40, F02D21/08, F02D13/02, F02B1/12 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
F02D41/3035 (EP,US);
F02D41/006 (EP,US);
F02D41/0065 (EP,US);
F02D41/0057 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2015/19] |
Former [2007/47] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dieselmotor | [2005/40] | English: | Diesel Engine | [2005/40] | French: | Moteur Diesel | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 15.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.05.2015 | [2016/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0940569 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0042] , [0072] - [0079] *; | [A]EP1085176 (HINO MOTORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0056] - [0062] * * figures 20-22 *; | [X]EP1273770 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0013] , [0033] , [0034] *; | [A]JP2003286876 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [PX]WO2004057167 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT], et al) [PX] 1,2 * page 7, lines 33-35 * * page 8, lines 23-25 * | by applicant | JP2003083119 |