EP1581027 - Speaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Tohoku Pioneer Corporation 1105, Aza-Nikko, Ooaza-Kunomoto Tendo-shi Yamagata-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Tohoku Pioneer Corporation 1105, Aza-Nikko, Ooaza-Kunomoto Tendo-shi Yamagata-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiura, Hideaki c/o Tohoku Pioneer Corporation 1105, Aza Nikko Ooaza Kunomoto Tendo-shi Yamagata-ken / JP | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | Popp, Eugen, et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006421.1 | 23.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | JP20040085061 | 23.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004085061 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1581027 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1581027 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/00 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
H04R9/02 (EP,US);
H04R2201/34 (EP,US);
H04R2400/11 (EP,US);
H04R9/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lautsprecher | [2005/39] | English: | Speaker | [2005/39] | French: | Haut-parleur | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB801695 (ROLA CELESTION LTD) [Y] 6 * page 2, line 40 - line 42 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE9301425U (WEI, KUANG-TA, KEELUNG, TW) [A] 2-4* figures 1-4 *; | [Y]JPH10117472 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 2-4 * abstract * * figure 7; compound 8 * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * For the evaluation of this document the examiner has used the automated translation available at the IPDL website of the JPO *; | [XY]US6537234 (KOMATSU AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1,5 * figure 3; compounds 103, 106, 108, 111, 114, 115, 202 * * column 1, line 6 - line 9 * * column 1, line 31 - line 40 * * column 4, line 29 - line 45 * [Y] 2-4,6 |