EP1584777 - Closure system for a vehicle and method of operation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/41] | Closure system for a vehicle and method method of operation thereof | ||
[2008/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pollmann, Rainer Josefsbergstrasse 30 84424 Isen / DE | 02 /
Rohlfing, Manfred Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 20 42549 Velbert / DE | 03 /
Bandl, Peter Ligusterstrasse 4 84032 Altdorf / DE | 04 /
Witte, Martin Melaniastrasse 50 48683 Ahaus / DE | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Peter Christian Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider Patentanwälte Obere Karspüle 41 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | Schneider, Peter Christian Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider Patentanwälte Obere Karspüle 41 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006470.8 | 24.03.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | DE20041017243 | 05.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004017243 | [2005/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1584777 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584777 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20, E05B17/22 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
E05B81/78 (EP,US);
E05B77/34 (EP,US);
E05B81/77 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Title | German: | Schliesssystem für ein Fahrzeug und Verfahren zu dessen Betrieb | [2005/41] | English: | Closure system for a vehicle and method of operation thereof | [2008/23] | French: | Système de fermeture pour un véhicule et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2005/41] |
Former [2005/41] | Closure system for a vehicle and method method of operation thereof | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.10.2008 | CZ | 15.10.2008 | DK | 15.10.2008 | EE | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | IE | 15.10.2008 | IT | 15.10.2008 | LT | 15.10.2008 | NL | 15.10.2008 | PL | 15.10.2008 | RO | 15.10.2008 | SI | 15.10.2008 | SK | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | BG | 15.01.2009 | SE | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | ES | 26.01.2009 | IS | 15.02.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | AT | 24.03.2009 | GB | 24.03.2009 | LU | 24.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | HU | 16.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
AT | 24.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
LU | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
HU | 16.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
AT | 24.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
LU | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
AT | 24.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
AT | 24.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 15.10.2008 | |
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 15.10.2008 | |
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | FI | 15.10.2008 | |
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 15.10.2008 | |
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 26.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE19620059 (IFM ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003101781 (BUDZYNSKI EDGAR [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 25 * * page 5, paragraph 77 - paragraph 80; figure 10 *; | [A]DE10204025 (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 5, paragraph 32 * * column 7, paragraph 44 *; | [A]WO03071069 (SCHAFFNER EMV AG [CH], et al) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 1 * |