EP1584579 - Device for transferring upright syringes or bottles in packaging material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UHLMANN PAC-SYSTEME GmbH & Co. KG Uhlmannstrasse 14-18 88471 Laupheim / DE | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Florczak, Werner Panoramastrasse 17 88433 Schemmerhofen / DE | 02 /
Schäffer, Johann Ahornweg 11 88471 Laupheim / DE | 03 /
Amann, Sandra Zwischen den Wegen 53 88471 Laupheim / DE | 04 /
Gnann, Kurt Sattenbeurer Weg 8 88427 Bad Schussenried / DE | 05 /
Habdank, Markus Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 1 88471 Laupheim / DE | 06 /
Mayer, Hubert Obergreut 2 88410 Bad Wurzach / DE | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Hentrich, Swen Patentanwalt Syrlinstrasse 35 89073 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [2005/41] | Hentrich, Swen, et al Patentanwälte Dres. Fay Dziewior & Hentrich Postfach 17 67 89007 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006491.4 | 24.03.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | DE20041017228 | 05.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004017228 | [2005/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584579 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1584579 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65G11/02 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
B65G11/02 (EP);
B65G11/023 (EP);
B65G27/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Überführen von aufrecht angeordneten Spritzen in Verpackungsmaterial | [2005/41] | English: | Device for transferring upright syringes or bottles in packaging material | [2005/41] | French: | Dispositif pour transférer des seringues ou bouteilles verticales dans une boite d'emballage | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3467236 (DHANDA RAJAT) [Y] 1,7 * column 3, line 22 - line 70 * * column 7, line 12 - column 8, line 58; figure -; claim - * [A] 2,3; | [A]US4174028 (BARNES GERALD [US]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * column 4, line 8 - column 8, line 43; figure - *; | [YA]US4360095 (BALDWIN WILBUR A, et al) [Y] 1,7 * column 3, line 67 - column 6, line 33; figure -; claim - * [A] 2; | [A]US4453626 (ROBERTS WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | US3467236 | DE3151088 | EP1125870 |