EP1704884 - Device for the dosed administration of a fluid product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Disetronic Licensing AG Kirchbergstrasse 190 3401 Burgdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geiser, Simone Mattenstrasse 6 4900 Langenthal / CH | 02 /
Peter, Daniel Stegenweg 46 3172 Niederwangen / CH | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Wess, Wolfgang Schwabe Sandmair Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [2008/42] |
Former [2006/39] | Wess, Wolfgang Schwabe-Sandmair-Marx, Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006543.2 | 24.03.2005 | [2006/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1704884 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1704884 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M5/145 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
A61M5/14566 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14264 (EP,US);
A61M5/16831 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die dosierte Verabreichung eines fluiden Produkts | [2006/39] | English: | Device for the dosed administration of a fluid product | [2006/39] | French: | Dispositif pour la distribution dosée d'un produit fluide | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.11.2008 | CZ | 12.11.2008 | DK | 12.11.2008 | EE | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | IE | 12.11.2008 | IT | 12.11.2008 | LT | 12.11.2008 | NL | 12.11.2008 | PL | 12.11.2008 | RO | 12.11.2008 | SI | 12.11.2008 | SK | 12.11.2008 | TR | 12.11.2008 | BG | 12.02.2009 | SE | 12.02.2009 | GR | 13.02.2009 | ES | 23.02.2009 | IS | 12.03.2009 | AT | 24.03.2009 | GB | 24.03.2009 | LU | 24.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | HU | 13.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
AT | 24.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
LU | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
AT | 24.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
LU | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
AT | 24.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
AT | 24.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
AT | 24.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 12.11.2008 | |
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 12.11.2008 | |
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | FI | 12.11.2008 | |
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 12.11.2008 | |
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 23.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0514816 (IVAC CORP [US]) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 5; figures 2,3 *; | [XA]DE4133402 (B. BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG, 3508 MELSUNGEN, DE) [X] 1-8,14,18,19 * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 29; figures 1,2 * [A] 9-13,15-17; | [A]US5492534 (ATHAYDE AMULYA L [US], et al) [A] 1* column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 4; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE19717107 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH]) [DA] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO0172357 (MINIMED INC [US]) [DA] 1-19 * page 21, line 6 - page 22, line 5; figure 9 *; | [A]US2004122366 (KAZEMZADEH FARHAD [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0027]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2004089448 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 21, lines 22-31; figure 15 *; | [A]EP1498150 (CONSEILS DE RECH SET D APPLIC [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0060] , [0061] * |