EP1591037 - Brush unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTI-WERKZEUGE GMBH Steinbruchweg 2b 53227 Bonn / DE | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Montabaur, Werner Florianstrasse 3 53639 Königswinter / DE | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2011/35] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2009/04] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2006/11] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | Honke, Manfred, et al Patentanwälte, Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006570.5 | 24.03.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | DE20041021188 | 29.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004021188 | [2005/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1591037 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1591037 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1591037 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A46B13/02, A46B3/20, A46B13/00, A46D1/00 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
A46B13/02 (EP,US);
A47J31/10 (KR);
A46B13/001 (EP,US);
A46B17/00 (EP,US);
A46B17/06 (EP,US);
A46B2200/3093 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/44] | A46B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Title | German: | Bürstenaggregat | [2005/44] | English: | Brush unit | [2005/44] | French: | Unité de brosses | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 10.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2005 | CY | 31.08.2011 | CZ | 31.08.2011 | EE | 31.08.2011 | IE | 31.08.2011 | LT | 31.08.2011 | SI | 31.08.2011 | SK | 31.08.2011 | BG | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.12.2011 | IS | 31.12.2011 | LU | 24.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
LU | 24.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | LT | 31.08.2011 | |
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | LT | 31.08.2011 | |
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 31.08.2011 | |
IS | 31.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2279608 (WOOD FRANK J) [X] 1-2,4-5,12,14 * page 3, line 129 - page 4, line 20; figures 11-14 * [A] 3,6-11,13; | [A]GB555428 (CARNEGIE ILLINOIS STEEL CORP) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 21 - page 4; figure 4 *; | [A]US3550320 (KENYON DAVID W, et al) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 8 - page 4; figures 2,3,4 *; | [A]DE3718932 (KOEPPEN DETLEF [DE]) [A] 1-14* page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 21; figure 2 *; | [XA]JP2001334453 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,3,5,11-12,14 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4,6-10,13 | Examination | US5524315 |