EP1579875 - Implant made with titanium or titanium alloy and surface treating method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GC Corporation 76-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8585 / JP | [2008/33] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states GC Corporation 76-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuboki, Takuo 2-17-22-303, Higashiyama Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 02 /
Maekawa, Kenji 3-21-23-208, Ifuku-cho Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Yasuhiro 2-4-10-505, Higashifurumatsu Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 04 /
Mine, Atsushi 53-1-1304 Nishifurumatsu Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 05 /
Fujisawa, Takuo 17-16-1, Tsushima Honnmachi Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 06 /
Suzuki, Kazuomi 880-152, Minato Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | 07 /
van Meerbeek, Bart St. Jansbergsestnwg Heverlee 3001 / BE | 08 /
Kaneko, Tadashi GC Corporation No. 76-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006656.2 | 24.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | JP20040088551 | 25.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004088551 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579875 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1579875 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/06, A61L27/36, A61C8/00, A61F2/00, A61F2/30 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A61L27/227 (EP,US);
A61L27/06 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Implantat aus Titan oder einer Titanlegierung und Verfahren zu seiner Oberflächenbehandlung | [2008/08] | English: | Implant made with titanium or titanium alloy and surface treating method thereof | [2005/39] | French: | Implant fabriqué de titane ou alliage de titane et son procédé de traitement de surface | [2008/08] |
Former [2005/39] | Implantat aus Titan oder Titanlegierung hergestellt ist und deren Verfahren zur Oberflächenbehandlung | ||
Former [2005/39] | Implant fabriqué de titane ou alliage de titane et son procède de traitement de surface | Examination procedure | 03.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | LT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | PL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | IS | 13.12.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | IE | 24.03.2009 | LU | 24.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
IE | 24.03.2009 | ||
LU | 24.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 24.03.2009 | ||
LU | 24.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 24.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 24.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 24.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 24.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1401233 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 9 - line 29 * * page 2, line 57 - line 60 * * example 2 * * claims 1,9,10 *; | [A]US2003135282 (ANITUA EDUARDO ALDECOA [ES]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0035] * * claim - *; | [A]CN1451367 (HUANAN SCI & ENGRG UNIV [CN]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A] - PULEO D A ET AL, A technique to immobilize bioactive proteins, including bone morphogenetic protein-4 (BMP-4), on titanium alloy, BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, PAGE(S) 2079-2087, (200205), ISSN 0142-9612, XP004345254 [A] 1-5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(01)00339-8 | [T] - LIU X ET AL, "Surface modification of titanium, titanium alloys, and related materials for biomedical applications", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING R: REPORTS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (20041224), vol. 47, no. 3-4, ISSN 0927-796X, pages 49 - 121, XP004722113 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mser.2004.11.001 | by applicant | JPH05285212 | US5285213 | JPH08299429 | JPH10108905 |