EP1582291 - Gripping device for a constructional element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hundegger, Hans Kemptener Strasse 1 87749 Hawangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Hundegger, Hans Kemptener Strasse 1 D-87749 Hawangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Rapp, Bertram Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Rapp, Bertram Charrier Rapp & Liebau - Patentanwälte Anwaltshaus Volkhartstrasse 7 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/13] | Rapp, Bertram Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Anwaltshaus Volkhartstrasse 7 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Pfister, Stefan Helmut Ulrich, et al Pfister & Pfister Patent-& Rechtsanwälte Hallhof 6-7 87700 Memmingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006708.1 | 29.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | DE20041017046 | 02.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004017046 | [2005/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582291 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q7/04, B23Q7/14 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
B66C1/445 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für das Ergreifen einer Bauteillage | [2005/40] | English: | Gripping device for a constructional element | [2005/40] | French: | Système de préhension pour un élément de construction | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE1801479 (LINGL HANS) [X] 1-9,11,14-17 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 * [Y] 6,14; | [A]DE2213770 (LAPOINTE MACHINE TOOL CO) [A] 1-20* page 14, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 1; figures 10,11 *; | [XY]GB2042460 (LUMBARD A, et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,15-17 * page 1, line 124 - page 3, line 39; figures 3,4 * [Y] 6,14; | [A]DE19601355 (GROEGER EDWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19804219 (GROEGER GUNNAR [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |