EP1583302 - Message distribution system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosono, Shizu c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006882.4 | 30.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040101935 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004101935 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1583302 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1583302 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H04L51/214 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/27] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Nachrichtenverteilung | [2005/40] | English: | Message distribution system and method | [2005/40] | French: | Système et procédé de distribution de messages | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 11.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2002026360 (MCGREGOR G MARK [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,10,11,21,22,28,29 * paragraphs [0058] - [0061] - [0070] * [A] 1,2,5-9,12-20,23-27,30-32; | [A]US2002049836 (SHIBUYA ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1,8,15,17,19,26* paragraphs [0118] - [0129] *; | [XY]US2002137507 (WINKLER YAIR [IL]) [X] 1,2,5-9,12-20,23-27,30-32 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0020]; figures 1-3; claims 1-12 * [Y] 3,4,10,11,21,22,28,29 |