EP1604645 - Therapeutic and cosmetic use of Viscous compositions containing carbon dioxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/50] | Viscous compositions containing carbon dioxide | ||
[2009/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medion Research Laboratories Inc. 4-20-602, Minami-machi 3-chome, Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 654-0036 / JP | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Masaya 4-20-602, Minamimachi 3-chome Suma-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 654-0036 / JP | 02 /
Hiki, Masato 16-17, Mikunihonmachi 3-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532-0005 / JP | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006945.9 | 05.10.1998 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | JP19970305151 | 07.11.1997 Original published format: JP 30515197 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604645 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604645 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/19, A61Q7/02, A61Q11/00, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/02, A61Q19/06, A61K33/00, A61K47/32, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61K47/42, A61K47/02, A61K9/06 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
A61Q17/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/0204 (EP,US);
A61K8/046 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K9/122 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61Q19/06 (EP,US);
A61Q7/02 (EP,US);
A61K2800/222 (EP,US);
A61K2800/75 (EP,US);
A61Q19/007 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | A61K7/48, A61K7/155, A61K33/00, A61K47/32, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61K47/42, A61K47/02, A61K9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/50] | Title | German: | Therapeutische und kosmetische Verwendung von viskosen Zusammensetzungen enthaltend Kohlendioxid | [2009/19] | English: | Therapeutic and cosmetic use of Viscous compositions containing carbon dioxide | [2009/19] | French: | Utilisation thérapeutique et cosmétique de compositions visqueuses comprenant du dioxyde de carbone | [2009/19] |
Former [2005/50] | Kosmetische Verwendung von viskosen Zusammensetzungen enthaltend Kohlendioxid | ||
Former [2005/50] | Viscous compositions containing carbon dioxide | ||
Former [2005/50] | Utilisation cosmétique de compositions visqueuses comprenant du dioxyde de carbone | Examination procedure | 30.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 28.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98945627.2 / EP1043023 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.09.2009 | BE | 23.09.2009 | CY | 23.09.2009 | DK | 23.09.2009 | FI | 23.09.2009 | SE | 23.09.2009 | LU | 05.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | GR | 24.12.2009 | PT | 25.01.2010 | [2011/21] |
Former [2010/51] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 23.09.2009 | |
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 23.09.2009 | |
SE | 23.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59106415 ; | [A]JPH05229933 ; | [A]JPH01172319 ; | [X]JPS62181219 ; | [X]JPS63267724 ; | [X]GB702952 (MURPHY CHEMICAL LTD, et al) [X] 1-30 * page 1, line 55 - page 1, line 66 * * page 1, line 75 - page 1, line 83 *; | [X]US4487757 (KIOZPEOPLOU DIANA K [US]) [X] 1,3,4,17-30 * examples 1-6 *; | [A]EP0362655 (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG [DE]) [A] 1-30 * example 5 *; | [A]EP0380253 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-30 * examples 1-12 *; | [A]WO9014070 (WELLA AG [DE]) [A] 1-30 * page 3, paragraph 1 and 2; page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [X]EP0467776 (DUBOIS JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1-30 * page 1, line 7 - page 1, line 23 *; | [A]US5100674 (SER JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1-30 * example 5 *; | [X]WO9619189 (LINGNER & FISCHER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,17-30 * examples 1-3 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841009), vol. 008, no. 222, Database accession no. (C - 246), & JP59106415 A 19840620 (KAO SEKKEN KK) [X] 1-30 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 40, Database accession no. 1993-317377, XP002192538 & JPH05229933 A 19930907 (ISHIGAKI K) [A] 1-30 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891006), vol. 013, no. 447, Database accession no. (C - 642), & JP01172319 A 19890707 (NISSAN SETSUKEN KK) [A] 1-30 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880130), vol. 012, no. 033, Database accession no. (C - 472), & JP62181219 A 19870808 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-30 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890222), vol. 013, no. 079, Database accession no. (C - 571), & JP63267724 A 19881104 (DOWA MINING CO LTD) [X] 1-30 * abstract * |