EP1707850 - Transmission device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Albisriederstrasse 245 8047 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bucher, Johannes Mariahaldenstrasse 17 8872 Weesen / CH | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2008/07] |
Former [2008/02] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Berg, Peter Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05007038.2 | 31.03.2005 | [2006/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1707850 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1707850 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/24, F16K31/04 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
F16K31/047 (EP,US);
F16H25/2454 (EP,US);
F16H2025/2463 (EP,US);
F16H2035/005 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18696 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18704 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19702 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [2007/24] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Getriebevorrichtung | [2006/40] | English: | Transmission device | [2006/40] | French: | Dispositif de transmission | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 06.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4623051 (LOCHMOELLER STEPHEN A [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19525454 (BEIKIRCH INDUSTRIEELEKTRONIK G [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]DE10306875 (ROEMHELD A GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029]; figure 5 *; | [X]EP1515415 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,10 * paragraph [0003]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0014]; claim 4 *; | [E]DE10354338 (SUSPA HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * claim 1 * |