EP1582390 - Drive force control method for four-wheel drive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/41] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Atsushi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1,Chuo 1-chome,Wako-shi Saitama-ken, 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Shibahata, Yasuji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama-ken, 351-0193 / JP | [2009/40] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
Mori, Atsushi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo Wako-shi Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
Shibahata, Yasuji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo Wako-shi Saitama-ken 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05007100.0 | 31.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040105023 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004105023 | JP20040105024 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004105024 | JP20040105025 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004105025 | JP20040105026 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004105026 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582390 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582390 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | [2006/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582390 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K23/08, B60K17/35 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
B60K23/0808 (EP);
B60K17/35 (EP);
F16H48/36 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2520/125 (EP);
B60W2540/18 (EP);
F16H2048/204 (EP);
F16H2048/346 (EP);
F16H2048/366 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/40] | B60K23/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/13] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antriebskraft- Steuerungsverfahren für vierradgetriebenes Fahrzeug | [2005/40] | English: | Drive force control method for four-wheel drive vehicle | [2005/40] | French: | Procédé de commande de force de traction pour véhicule à quatre roues motrices | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PDX]JP2004114778 ; | [DX]JPH01182128 ; | [DX]JPH01233124 ; | [X]EP0311140 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 10, line 23 - column 11, line 10; figures 1-3,6 *; | [X]EP0335335 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 1; figure 2 *; | [X]DE3908152 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4* abstract *; | [X]US4981191 (SHIBAHATA YASUJI [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract *; | [X]EP0453931 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 10 * * column 10, line 4 - line 36 *; | [A]US2002153770 (MATSUNO KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 2 * paragraphs [0079] - [0082] *; | [A]US2004059491 (YONEDA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0078]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2004058776 (IMAMURA MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraphs [0062] , [0122] - [0124] - [0128]; figures 1,2,23 * | [PDX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004114778 A 20040415 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [PDX] 1,4 * abstract * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891020), vol. 013, no. 465, Database accession no. (M - 882), & JP01182128 A 19890720 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DX] 1,3,4 * abstract * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891213), vol. 013, no. 560, Database accession no. (M - 906), & JP01233124 A 19890918 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DX] 1,3,4 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0311140 | JPH01182128 | JPH01233124 | EP0335335 | EP0453931 | JP2004114778 |