EP1582392 - Control method for four-wheel drive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/11] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Atsushi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken, 351 / JP | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05007114.1 | 31.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040105026 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004105026 | JP20040105023 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004105023 | JP20040105025 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004105025 | JP20040105024 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004105024 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582392 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582392 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582392 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60K23/08, B60K17/35 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B60K23/0808 (EP);
B60K17/35 (EP);
F16H48/36 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2520/125 (EP);
B60W2540/18 (EP);
F16H2048/204 (EP);
F16H2048/346 (EP);
F16H2048/366 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/40] | B60K23/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/21] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerungsverfahren für vierradgetriebenes Fahrzeug | [2005/40] | English: | Control method for four-wheel drive vehicle | [2005/40] | French: | Procédé de commande pour véhicule à quatre roues motrices | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXAY]JPH01233124 ; | [PDA]JP2004114778 ; | [DA]JPH01182128 ; | [A]JPS60226326 ; | [Y]DE3630754 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * column 2, line 51 - line 56; figure 3 *; | [XAY]DE3908152 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * column 10, line 13 - line 20 * * column 10, line 43 - line 66; figures 11,13 * [A] 2-4,7 [Y] 5,6; | [A]US4981191 (SHIBAHATA YASUJI [JP]) [A] 1,4* column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4989686 (MILLER ALAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US5839084 (TAKASAKI TOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6033337 (OHKUMA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, line 38 - line 56; figure 6 *; | [A]US2004059491 (YONEDA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0073]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2004058776 (IMAMURA MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,4 * paragraphs [0047] , [0116] - [0119]; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]US6752233 (SHAKESPEAR DANIEL [DE]) [PX] 2,3 * column 5, line 30 - line 36 * * column 8, line 6 - line 17; figure 6 * | [DXAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891213), vol. 013, no. 560, Database accession no. (M - 906), & JP01233124 A 19890918 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DX] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * [A] 2-4,7 [Y] 5,6 | [PDA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004114778 A 20040415 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [PDA] 1,4 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891020), vol. 013, no. 465, Database accession no. (M - 882), & JP01182128 A 19890720 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860405), vol. 010, no. 088, Database accession no. (M - 467), & JP60226326 A 19851111 (DAIHATSU KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0761779 | JPH0764219 | JP2002278836 |