EP1584495 - Automatic detector device for a tyre assembling-disasssembling machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUTLER ENGINEERING & MARKETING SPA Via Dell'Ecologia, 6 42047 Rolo, Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states BUTLER ENGINEERING & MARKETING SPA Via Balduina, 5/7 42010 Rio Saliceto (Reggio Emilia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzaga, Tullio Via Canolo, 41 Correggio (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Patents Piazza Bra, 28 37121 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Patents Piazza Bra, 28 37121 Verona / IT | ||
Former [2005/41] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano c/o Dr.Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Via D. Manin, 5 37122 Verona / IT | Application number, filing date | 05007139.8 | 01.04.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | IT2004VR00055 | 09.04.2004 Original published format: IT VR20040055 | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584495 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1584495 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584495 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60C25/138 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
B60C25/138 (EP,US);
B60C25/0551 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Title | German: | Automatische Detektoreinrichtung für ein Reifen-Montiergerät | [2005/41] | English: | Automatic detector device for a tyre assembling-disasssembling machine | [2005/41] | French: | Détecteur automatique pour une machine de montage/démontage de pneumatiques | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2008 | BE | 21.05.2008 | CY | 21.05.2008 | CZ | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | EE | 21.05.2008 | FI | 21.05.2008 | LT | 21.05.2008 | NL | 21.05.2008 | PL | 21.05.2008 | RO | 21.05.2008 | SI | 21.05.2008 | SK | 21.05.2008 | TR | 21.05.2008 | BG | 21.08.2008 | SE | 21.08.2008 | GR | 22.08.2008 | IS | 21.09.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | HU | 22.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
GR | 22.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
HU | 22.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
GR | 22.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
LT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 21.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 21.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06270619 ; | [A]DE2529343 (HOFMANN MASCHF GEB) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 3 *; | [PA]EP1479538 (BUTLER ENG & MARKETING [IT]) [PA] 1* figures 8-10 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941222), vol. 018, no. 682, Database accession no. (M - 1729), & JP06270619 A 19940927 (BANZAI:KK) [X] 1-6,9,10,12-14 * abstract * |