EP1584390 - Throwaway insert and throwaway-type rotary cutting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 3-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 3-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | ||
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daiguji, Hisashi Tsukuba Plant 1511, Furumagi Ishigemachi Yuuki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05007199.2 | 01.04.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | JP20040112078 | 06.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004112078 | JP20050063937 | 08.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005063937 | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584390 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1584390 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584390 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10, B23C5/20 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
B23C5/109 (EP);
B23C5/202 (EP);
B23C2200/0472 (EP);
B23C2200/203 (EP);
B23C2200/286 (EP);
B23C2200/326 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Title | German: | Schneideinsatz und rotierendes Schneidewerkzeug dafür | [2005/41] | English: | Throwaway insert and throwaway-type rotary cutting tool | [2005/41] | French: | Plaquette de coupe et outil de coupe rotatif | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 30.06.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 04.08.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09162274.6 / EP2105229 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2007 | 30.04.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | BE | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | IE | 01.04.2011 | LU | 01.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
TR | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2011 | ||
LU | 01.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2011 | ||
LU | 01.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 24.11.2010 | |
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 24.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0392730 (ISCAR LTD [IL]); | [A]EP0457488 (ISCAR LTD [IL]) [A] 4* figure 1 *; | [A]EP0585800 (ISCAR LTD [IL]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 46 - page 5, line 24 *; | [A]EP0956921 (SANDVIK AB [SE]); | [A]US2002192041 (WALLSTROM LARS-GUNNAR [SE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0027] *; | [A]EP1344595 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0042] , [0050] *; | [AP]DE10336616 (OSG CORP [JP]); | [T]US2005089379 (FRANCIS MARK A [US], et al) |