EP1587190 - Electrical cabinet made of panel elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rittal GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg 35745 Herborn / DE | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benner, Rolf Wilhelmstrasse 8 35745 Herbom-Amdorf / DE | 02 /
Schauwecker, Uwe Guntersdorfer Strasse 13 35745 Herbom / DE | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Angerhausen, Christoph, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Tönhardt, Marion, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | Fleck, Hermann-Joseph, et al Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 05007218.0 | 01.04.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | DE20041020296 | 18.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004020296 | [2005/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1587190 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/30 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
H02B1/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, IT [2006/26] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schrankkorpus für einen Schaltschrank | [2005/42] | English: | Electrical cabinet made of panel elements | [2005/42] | French: | Armoire électrique composée d'éléments-panneaux | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 10.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3480345 (TOROK JOZSEF) [A] 1* figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1355395 (KARL KUKLIES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 * |