EP1582854 - System and method for the measurement of optical distortions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2005/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Michael E. 816 Wayne Trail Azle Texas 76020 / US | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Meier, Frank Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Meier, Frank Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Zippelhaus 5 20457 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05007289.1 | 04.04.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | US20040817538 | 02.04.2004 Original published format: US 817538 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582854 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582854 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582854 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
G01M11/00 (EP,US);
G01N21/958 (EP,US);
G01N2021/9586 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/24] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Messung von optischen Störungen | [2005/40] | English: | System and method for the measurement of optical distortions | [2005/40] | French: | Système et procédé pour messurer des obstructions optique | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.01.2010 | GB | 13.04.2010 | FR | 30.04.2010 | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/17] | IT | 13.01.2010 | |
GB | 13.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | IT | 13.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0176336 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [Y]US4647197 (KITAYA KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 10,11 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0484237 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [Y] 1-4 * column 6, line 26 - line 34; figures 2-4 * * column 7, line 22 - line 28 *; | [YA]US5446536 (MIYAKE ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,10,11 * column 6, line 32 - line 69; figures 7,9 * * column 10, line 37 - line 45; claims 13,17,18,21 * [A] 5-9,12,13 | by applicant | EP0176336 | EP0484237 | US5446536 |