EP1586730 - Safety blocking device for a sectional door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Achenbach GmbH & Co.KG Zinzinger Strasse 11 66119 Saarbrücken / DE | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilges, Fred, Dipl-Ing. Pfählerstrasse 12 a DE-66128 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
Parino, Jürgen Mozartstrasse 1 DE-66299 Bildstock / DE | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Vièl, Christof, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Vièl & Wieske PartGmbB Postfach 65 04 03 66143 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Vièl, Christof, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Vièl & Wieske Postfach 65 04 03 66143 Saarbrücken / DE | Application number, filing date | 05007297.4 | 04.04.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | DE20042005668U | 07.04.2004 Original published format: DE 202004005668 U | [2005/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1586730 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1586730 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1586730 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05D13/00 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
E05D13/006 (EP);
E05Y2900/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Title | German: | Sicherungsblockademittel für ein Deckenlauftor | [2005/42] | English: | Safety blocking device for a sectional door | [2005/42] | French: | Dispositif de blocage de sécurité pour une porte sectionnelle | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.01.2009 | CZ | 14.01.2009 | DK | 14.01.2009 | EE | 14.01.2009 | FI | 14.01.2009 | IE | 14.01.2009 | IT | 14.01.2009 | LT | 14.01.2009 | PL | 14.01.2009 | RO | 14.01.2009 | SI | 14.01.2009 | SK | 14.01.2009 | TR | 14.01.2009 | BG | 14.04.2009 | SE | 14.04.2009 | GR | 15.04.2009 | ES | 25.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | IS | 14.05.2009 | PT | 15.06.2009 | HU | 15.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
HU | 15.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 14.01.2009 | |
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 14.01.2009 | |
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | FI | 14.01.2009 | |
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 14.01.2009 | |
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]NL53486C (PETRUS JOHANNES VAN BROEKHOVEN) [X] 1,5 * the whole document * * figures 1,2; compounds 8-12 * [A] 3; | [XA]DE3710237 (METALLWERK GUENTHER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4,7,8 * * claim 1 * * column 4, lines 47-60 * * claims 2,3,5 * * column 4, lines 61-66 * [A] 3-5; | [X]FR2809763 (PORTES DOOR [ES]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO03023173 (WAYNE DALTON CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * figures 2,3,2a ** page 10, lines 13-20 *; | [XPA]FR2851604 (TRENDEL ET FILS A [FR]) [XP] 1,5 * figures 2,3a,4 * * claims 1,6 * * claim 4 * [AP] 3 | by applicant | NL53486C | DE3710237 | FR2809763 | EP1260665 |