EP1589198 - Hydraulic device for continuous camshaft adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2005/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pater, Piet Am Mühlbachbogen 12 85368 Moosburg / DE | 02 /
Conrad, Holger Hauptstrasse 15 98646 Hessberg / DE | [2005/43] | Application number, filing date | 05007351.9 | 05.04.2005 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | DE20041019771 | 23.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004019771 | [2005/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1589198 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1589198 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/344 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
F01L1/3442 (EP);
F01L2001/34453 (EP);
F01L2001/34469 (EP);
F01L2001/34483 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/42] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hydraulische Einrichtung zur stufenlos variablen Nockenwellenverstellung | [2005/43] | English: | Hydraulic device for continuous camshaft adjustment | [2005/43] | French: | Dispositif hydraulique pour variation continue de phase d'arbre à cames | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 27.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0937865 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-8 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0038] * [I] 10-12; | [X]US6155219 (FUKUHARA KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-12 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 23 * * column 5, line 26 - column 7, line 45 *; | [AD]DE19961567 (BEEZ GUENTHER [DE], et al) [AD] 1* abstract *; | [X]EP1128026 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [X] 1,3-12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0034] *; | [X]US2002043230 (KINUGAWA HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0061] *; | [X]WO2004033860 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12 * page 2, line 23 - page 6, line 1; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE19961567 |