blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1584511

EP1584511 - Vehicle power transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.2009
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.12.2009  [2009/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD.
2-18-1, Inadera Amagasaki-shi
Hyogo / JP
[2009/04]
Former [2005/41]For all designated states
KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD.
2-18-1, Inadera Amagasaki-shi
Hyogo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ima, Akihiro
2-18-1 Inadera
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP
02 / Ohtsuki, Kazuhiko
2-18-1 Inadera
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP
03 / Hasegawa, Toshiyuki
2-18-1 Inadera
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP
04 / Yasui, Kenichi
2-18-1 Inadera
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP
 [2005/41]
Representative(s)Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/41]Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date05007374.105.04.2005
[2005/41]
Priority number, dateJP2004011427508.04.2004         Original published format: JP 2004114275
JP2004013556830.04.2004         Original published format: JP 2004135568
[2005/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1584511
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1584511
Date:21.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2005
ClassificationIPC:B60K17/34
[2005/41]
CPC:
B60K17/34 (EP,US); B60K17/08 (EP,US); B60K17/22 (EP,US);
B60K17/28 (EP,US); B60K17/342 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/25]
Former [2005/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kraftübertragungssystem für ein Fahrzeug[2005/41]
English:Vehicle power transmission system[2005/41]
French:Système de transmission de puissance du véhicule[2005/41]
Examination procedure07.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/18]
30.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2008Fee for grant paid
05.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB460619  (HUGH LEWIS PINGO LESTER) [A] 1-27* figure 1 *;
 [XA]US2001004031  (HASEGAWA TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-17,19 * figure 1 * [A] 22,25;
 [A]WO03066362  (MAGNA STEYR FAHRZEUGTECHNIK AG [AT], et al) [A] 1-27 * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.