EP1586788 - Wave spring with progressive load-deflection characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2016 | Opposition rejected | published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Muhr und Bender KG In den Schlachtwiesen 4 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heim, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Unterlangnau 23 88069 Tettnang / DE | 02 /
Rinsdorf, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. Siegener Strasse 173 57258 Freudenberg / DE | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, et al Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05007503.5 | 06.04.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | DE20041018711 | 17.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004018711 | [2005/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1586788 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1586788 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1586788 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/32 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
F16F1/328 (EP,US);
F16D13/69 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Title | German: | Wellfeder mit definierter progressiver Federkennlinie | [2005/42] | English: | Wave spring with progressive load-deflection characteristics | [2005/42] | French: | Ressort ondulé avec caractéristiques progressives | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.06.2008
ADMISSIBLE Christian Bauer GmbH & Co. Schorndorfer Strasse 49 73642 Welzheim / DE Opponent's representative Jooß, Martin BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.06.2008
ADMISSIBLE Christian Bauer GmbH & Co. Schorndorfer Strasse 49 73642 Welzheim / DE Opponent's representative Jooß, Martin Bongen, Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | 04.08.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.12.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.05.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.10.2015 | 22.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.11.2015 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/13] | Appeal following opposition | 30.07.2010 | Appeal received No. T1636/10 | 27.09.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.12.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 04.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.09.2007 | CZ | 26.09.2007 | DK | 26.09.2007 | EE | 26.09.2007 | FI | 26.09.2007 | IE | 26.09.2007 | LT | 26.09.2007 | PL | 26.09.2007 | RO | 26.09.2007 | SI | 26.09.2007 | SK | 26.09.2007 | TR | 26.09.2007 | BG | 26.12.2007 | GR | 27.12.2007 | IS | 26.01.2008 | PT | 26.02.2008 | HU | 27.03.2008 | LU | 06.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | CY | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
BG | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
HU | 27.03.2008 | ||
LU | 06.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
BG | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
LU | 06.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
BG | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CY | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SI | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
IS | 26.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
PL | 26.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
LT | 26.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 26.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11270605 ; | [A]JPH0932874 ; | [A]DE2600946 (BOGE GMBH) [A] 1,3 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [PD]DE10321800 (MUHR & BENDER KG [DE]) [PD] 1,3* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11270605 A 19991005 (MUSASHI SEIMITSU IND CO LTD) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09032874 A 19970204 (NHK SPRING CO LTD) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10321800 |