Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1617120 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2009 | B1 | EP1617120 | 18.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0415708 | 14.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005015392D1 | 27.08.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB0415708 | 14.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0415708D0 | 18.08.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0415708 | 14.07.2004 |