EP1617120 - Retaining clip for holding heating tubes in a heated floor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yorkshire Building Services (Whitwell) Ltd The Crags Industrial Park, Morven Street Creswell, Derbyshire S80 4AJ / GB | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Carl Steven 113A Chesterfield Road Sheffield S8 0RN / GB | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Lock, Howard John, et al Howard Lock Intellectual Property Limited Westthorpe Business Innovation Centre Westthorpe Fields Business Park Killamarsh Sheffield S21 1TZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Lock, Howard John, et al Howard Lock Intellectual Property Westthorpe Business Innovation Centre Westthorpe Fields Business Park Killamarsh Sheffield S21 1TZ / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co, St. James House, 8th Floor, Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05008005.0 | 13.04.2005 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | GB20040015708 | 14.07.2004 Original published format: GB 0415708 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1617120 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1617120 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/123 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
F16L3/237 (EP);
F16L3/1233 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Title | German: | Halteclip zum Halten von Heizrohren einer Fussbodenheizung | [2006/03] | English: | Retaining clip for holding heating tubes in a heated floor | [2006/03] | French: | Attache de retenue pour maintenir des tubes de chauffage au plancher | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.2009 | BE | 15.07.2009 | CY | 15.07.2009 | CZ | 15.07.2009 | DK | 15.07.2009 | EE | 15.07.2009 | FI | 15.07.2009 | IT | 15.07.2009 | LT | 15.07.2009 | PL | 15.07.2009 | RO | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | SI | 15.07.2009 | SK | 15.07.2009 | TR | 15.07.2009 | BG | 15.10.2009 | GR | 16.10.2009 | ES | 26.10.2009 | IS | 15.11.2009 | PT | 15.11.2009 | HU | 16.01.2010 | IE | 13.04.2010 | LU | 13.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CY | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
HU | 16.01.2010 | ||
IE | 13.04.2010 | ||
LU | 13.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CY | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
HU | 16.01.2010 | ||
IE | 13.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CY | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 13.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 13.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 13.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3584348 (SOLTYSIK EDMUND JOHN) [X] 1-3,5-9 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 73; figures 1-8 * [Y] 4; | [Y]WO9106145 (ANGLO BUILDING COMPANY SUPPLIE [GB], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0945659 (AEML [FR]) [A] 1,2* abstract * | by applicant | US3584348 |