EP1563998 - Recording head and recording apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/33] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imanaka, Yoshiyuki c/o Canon Kab. Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kasamoto, Masami c/o Canon Kab. Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Furukawa, Tatsuo c/o Canon Kab. Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Mori, Toshihiro c/o Canon Kab. Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Ozaki, Teruo c/o Canon Kab. Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Watanabe, Hidenori c/o Canon Kab. Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Mochizuki, Muga c/o Canon Kab. Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Weser, Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05008266.8 | 25.06.1997 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | JP19960166089 | 26.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16608996 | JP19960197241 | 26.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19724196 | JP19960231081 | 30.08.1996 Original published format: JP 23108196 | JP19960300417 | 12.11.1996 Original published format: JP 30041796 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1563998 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1563998 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1563998 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1563998 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/05, B41J2/14 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
B41J2/04506 (EP,US);
B41J2/04541 (EP,US);
B41J2/04548 (EP,US);
B41J2/0455 (EP,US);
B41J2/0458 (EP,US);
B41J2/14016 (EP,US);
B41J2202/13 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/33] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungskopf und Aufzeichnungsapparat unter Verwendung desselben | [2010/41] | English: | Recording head and recording apparatus using the same | [2005/33] | French: | Tête d'enregistrement et appareil d'enregistrement l'utilisant | [2005/33] |
Former [2005/33] | Aufzeichnungskopf und Aufzeichnungsapparat unter Verwendung derselben | Examination procedure | 30.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97110413.8 / EP0816082 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Request for further processing for: | 22.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.08.2010 | [2011/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS59212283 ; | [Y]JPS63174422 ; | [Y]EP0499373 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 8-11* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0690411 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 2,13-15 * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850413), vol. 009, no. 084, Database accession no. (M - 371), & JP59212283 A 19841201 (SEIKO DENSHI KOGYO KK) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,12,19-21 * abstract * [Y] 2,5,8-11,13-15 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881124), vol. 012, no. 447, Database accession no. (E - 685), & JP63174422 A 19880718 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 5 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH05185594 |