EP1589562 - Plasma reactor for surface modification of articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states centrotherm photovoltaics AG Johannes-Schmid-Strasse 8 89143 Blaubeuren / DE | [2006/44] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states centrotherm Photovoltaics GmbH + Co. KG Johannes-Schmid-Strasse 3 89143 Blaubeuren / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wanka, Harald Dr. Lilienweg12 89143 Blaustein / DE | 02 /
Heintze, Moritz Dr. Fischergasse 7 89073 Ulm / DE | 03 /
Reichert, Johann Georg Hessenhöfe 46 89143 Blaubeuren / DE | 04 /
Völk, Hans-Peter Röthleweg 14 89608 Griesingen / DE | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Heyerhoff Geiger GmbH & Co. KG Heiligenbreite 52 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Heyerhoff & Geiger Patentanwälte Heiligenbreite 52 88662 Überlingen / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Heyerhoff, Markus Heyerhoff & Geiger Patentanwälte Heiligenbreite 52 88662 Überlingen / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | Hudler, Frank Lippert, Stachow & Partner Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 05008432.6 | 19.04.2005 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | DE20041019741 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004019741 | [2005/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1589562 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1589562 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
H01J37/32862 (EP,US);
H01J37/32357 (EP,US);
H01J37/32623 (EP,US);
H01J37/32761 (EP,US);
H01J2237/335 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/08] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, LI | ||
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmareaktor zu Oberflächenmodifikation von Gegenständen | [2005/43] | English: | Plasma reactor for surface modification of articles | [2005/43] | French: | Réacteur à plasma pour modification de surface d'objets | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 07.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5958155 (KAWAMATA KEN [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8* column 9, lines 42-62; figure 7 *; | [X]JP2001254179 (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1-3,7,8 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0011] - [0027]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO2004029324 (APPLIED MULTILAYERS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 18, paragraph 2; figures 3A-6 * |